MEMBERS EMERGENCY FUND FOR BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONAL WOMEN UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operating throughout England Wales Scotland and Northern Ireland, giving interest free loans or outright grants to subscribing members of BPW (UK) who have financial emergencies, relating to health, work or Acts of God
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 25 June 1964: Standard registration
- MEMBERS EMERGENCY FUND FOR BUSINESS AND PROFESIONAL WOMEN UK LIMITED (Previous name)
- MEMBERS EMERGENCY FUND FOR BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONAL WOMEN UK LIMITED (Previous name)
- MEMBERS EMERGENCY FUND FOR THE UNITED KINGDOM FEDERATION OF BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONAL WOMEN (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MISS ISOBEL MUNRO | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Nora Gleave | Trustee | 04 April 2025 |
|
|||||
Joanne Clare Kinsey | Trustee | 04 April 2025 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Jowett | Trustee | 03 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Mary McLoughlin | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
MRS J E HENLEY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £596 | £983 | £857 | £400 | £1.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.20k | £1.70k | £7.76k | £8.12k | £8.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 10/1953 AMENDED 1956 AND 1988 AND AS AFFECTED BY THE LETTER OF CONCURRENCE DATED 28/06/1997. RULES ADOPTED 03/1997 AS AMENDED 11/04/2003 AND 18/07/2009 AS AMENDED ON 06/03/2015 as amended on 27 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE FUND SHALL BE TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO MEMBERS OF BPW UK DURING TIMES OF NEED, OR PROVIDE DONATIONS/GRANTS TO OTHER WOMENS? ORGANISATIONS WITH SIMILAR CHARITABLE OBJECTIVES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 ST. MARYS GROVE
SEASALTER
WHITSTABLE
CT5 4BH
- Phone:
- 07860179372
- Email:
- bpwmef@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window