WOMEN'S INSTITUTE - CROMER

Charity number: 231919
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 03 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 10 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 05 November 2019 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 30 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2016 31 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 Not Required