CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES
Charity Number: 231950
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Helping the young with extra finance for Further Education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
Total income: £33
Total expenditure: £0
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
- Leicestershire
Governance
Registration history:
- 26 November 1963: Standard registration
- 18 December 2023: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80 | £82 | £83 | £85 | £33 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ENTRY IN P.R. VOL. 32, PART 5, P. 372.
Charitable objects
INCOME DISTRIBUTED ON ST. THOMAS'S DAY AMONGST THE POOREST PERSONS OF THE PARISH.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
PARISH OF BREEDON
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window