THE ST CHRISTOPHER'S COACH FUND FOR THE PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED

Charity number: 232052
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2019 18 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 11 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 13 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2016 02 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2015 10 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2015 Not Required