Financial history THE ST CHRISTOPHER'S COACH FUND FOR THE PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED

Charity number: 232052
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021
Total gross income £20 £516 £424 £20 £20
Total expenditure £19.27k £6.74k £9.65k £8.27k £6.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A