THE TOMLINSON AND BROMEHEAD CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants to elderly people's groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 03 June 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie Maureen Franks | Trustee | 03 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Molly Marlow | Trustee | 03 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ena Elizabeth Johnson | Trustee | 03 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Peet | Trustee | 20 August 2018 |
|
|||||
J S WATKINSON | Trustee | 01 December 1996 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £149 | £150 | £157 | £177 | £187 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 30 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 November 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS 15/4/1955
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE ARTICLES IN KIND OR GRANTS OF MONEY FOR THE BENEFIT OF AGED POOR WOMEN RESIDENT IN THE SAID ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH, BEING MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND.
Area of benefit
THE ECC. PARISH OF ST. JOHN THE EVANGELIST.
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 DEERLANDS ROAD
CHESTERFIELD
S40 4DF
- Phone:
- 01246278862
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window