ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS NORTHALLERTON THIRSK AND DALES BRANCH

Charity number: 232209
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £25.44k £29.87k £15.32k £25.70k £7.62k
Total expenditure £18.14k £38.74k £10.96k £24.81k £26.75k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A