Royal Society For The Prevention Of Cruelty To Animals York, Harrogate And District Branch

Charity number: 232222
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £514.48k £603.05k £841.60k £679.94k £999.75k
Total expenditure £868.71k £1.08m £1.25m £1.05m £787.06k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £133.83k
Income - Donations and legacies £186.41k £221.70k £291.90k £197.13k £437.03k
Income - Other trading activities £236.56k £266.96k £356.13k £292.86k £186.41k
Income - Charitable activities £88.77k £99.33k £164.67k £176.71k £238.70k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.73k £15.05k £28.91k £0 £3.77k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £13.24k £133.83k
Income - Legacies £145.84k £172.20k £227.32k £46.54k £279.51k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £681.13k £844.19k £954.91k £846.23k £626.04k
Expenditure - Raising funds £187.58k £231.03k £290.32k £198.32k £161.03k
Expenditure - Governance £3.00k £3.50k £4.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £2.30k £0