ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS HULL AND EAST RIDING BRANCH

Charity number: 232225
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 25 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 18 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 16 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 16 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 21 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 21 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 12 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 12 June 2017 On time Download