ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS HULL AND EAST RIDING BRANCH

Charity number: 232225
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £426.27k £451.01k £590.36k £1.15m £580.16k
Total expenditure £397.69k £484.14k £517.91k £492.78k £277.25k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £44.00k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £245.46k £741.91k £453.40k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £342.92k £344.24k £110.20k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 £62.57k £14.80k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £1.99k £1.70k £1.75k
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £108.18k £544.19k £110.23k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £288.56k £314.11k £165.39k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £41.58k £178.67k £111.86k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £26.22k £8.38k £6.28k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £187.77k £0 £0