ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS NEWCASTLE AND NORTH NORTHUMBERLAND BRANCH

Charity number: 232240
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £241.24k £271.56k £365.75k £220.97k £261.57k
Total expenditure £269.79k £279.68k £280.50k £234.55k £260.75k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A