Financial history THE MARJORIE AND DOROTHY WHYTE MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 232388
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £7.61k £8.03k £8.54k £8.91k £6.89k
Total expenditure £7.20k £7.37k £7.74k £8.17k £7.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A