THE LONDON SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA LIMITED

Charity number: 232391
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The principal activity of the LSO is the provision of a Symphony Orchestra for high quality musical performances, broadcasting and recordings and supporting this work with a music education programme designed to reach a wide range of people.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for being a trustee and providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 May 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • LSO (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sarah Quinn Chair 18 April 2023
THE LONDON SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA ENDOWMENT TRUST
Received: On time
Mark Beddy Trustee 08 April 2025
None on record
Amanda Truelove Trustee 18 April 2023
None on record
Daniel Jemison Trustee 18 April 2023
None on record
HHJ Anuja Dhir KC Trustee 18 April 2023
None on record
Stephen Doman Trustee 09 May 2022
None on record
Maxine Kwok Trustee 09 May 2022
None on record
Ben Thomson Trustee 09 May 2022
None on record
James Alexander Thomas Trustee 09 May 2022
SINFONIETTA PRODUCTIONS LIMITED
Received: On time
Professor David Michael Gann CBE Trustee 14 October 2021
None on record
Janis Elizabeth Susskind Trustee 20 June 2019
Britten Pears Arts
Received: On time
ROYAL OPERA HOUSE COVENT GARDEN FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Angela Barnes Trustee 08 March 2019
None on record
Harriet Rayfield Trustee 08 March 2019
None on record
David Jackson Trustee 19 February 2018
None on record
DAME MARY MARSH Trustee 22 March 2017
None on record
JONATHAN MOULDS Trustee 12 April 2011
None on record
KATHRYN ALEXANDRA MCDOWELL Trustee
THE LONDON SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA ENDOWMENT TRUST
Received: On time
HENRY WOOD HALL LIMITED
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £16.61m £11.77m £21.11m £21.52m £21.11m
Total expenditure £16.75m £12.24m £18.34m £21.13m £19.98m
Income from government contracts N/A £1.98m £1.98m £1.98m £2.00m
Income from government grants £4.20m £3.18m N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £6.12m £7.11m £7.88m £6.24m £7.72m
Income - Other trading activities £653.00k £44.00k £450.00k £487.00k £426.00k
Income - Charitable activities £8.12m £3.63m £10.34m £12.14m £9.85m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £8.00k £0 £1.00k £37.00k £55.00k
Income - Other £1.71m £980.00k £2.44m £2.62m £3.06m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £2.53m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £14.93m £11.20m £17.19m £19.68m £18.39m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.74m £1.04m £1.15m £1.45m £1.59m
Expenditure - Governance £58.00k £66.00k £61.00k £68.00k £68.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £81.00k £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Own use assets £1.84m £1.86m £2.42m £2.19m £2.25m
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £2.01m
Other assets £7.22m £7.48m £9.04m £9.90m £8.17m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £2.97m £3.78m £3.15m £3.37m £2.64m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 01 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 01 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2023 23 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 23 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 01 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 01 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 07 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 07 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 04 June 2021 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 04 June 2021 4 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Barbican Centre
Silk Street
LONDON
EC2Y 8DS
Phone:
02073821116