THE DOHNAVUR FELLOWSHIP CORPORATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supports the work of the Dohnavur Fellowship in India which runs a children's home and a rural hospital. It provides for retired missionaries who had given their lives to this work without salaries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 April 1964: Standard registration
- THE DOHNAVUR FELLOWSHIP CORPORATION (Working name)
- THE DOHNAVUR FELLOWSHIP (Previous name)
- THE DOHNAVUR FELLOWSHIP CORPORATION LIMITED (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Suzanne Eleanor Wavre | Chair | 01 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Olwen Brown | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Gordon | Trustee | 02 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michael Sylvester Packianather | Trustee | 24 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Stella Rosalind Mitchell GILL | Trustee | 15 December 2015 |
|
|||||
RALPH ANTHONY MANNING | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £486.32k | £202.29k | £219.16k | £155.63k | £288.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £251.88k | £237.49k | £238.53k | £252.41k | £348.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30TH JANUARY 1947 AMENDED 24TH MARCH 1950 AND 3RD MARCH 1952 21ST NOVEMBER 1990 AND 16 NOVEMBER 1993. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/10/2014
Charitable objects
TO SAVE CHILDREN FROM MORAL DANGER, TO TRAIN THEM TO SERVE OTHERS; TO RELIEVE EVERY KIND OF SUFFERING; TO MAKE KNOWN THE LOVE OF GOD BY ALL MEANS ESPECIALLY TO THE PEOPLE OF INDIA; AND TO PROVIDE FOR RETIRED MISSIONARIES OF THE DOHNAVUR FELLOWSHIP WHO HAVE GIVEN THEIR LIVES TO SUCH WORK. FOR DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 Templeway
LYDNEY
Gloucestershire
GL15 5HU
- Phone:
- 07516736722
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window