Accounts and annual returns HOSPITALLER ORDER OF SAINT JOHN OF GOD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 232539
Charity reporting is overdue by 267 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 267 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 267 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 25 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 24 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 24 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window