Financial history THE NORTHWOOD CHRISTIAN WORKERS' TRUST

Charity number: 232573
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £17.53k £17.44k £18.05k £17.84k £18.64k
Total expenditure £9.56k £6.62k £7.19k £13.94k £7.76k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A