Financial history THE HILDEN CHARITABLE FUND

Charity number: 232591
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £417.90k £425.31k £437.50k £405.48k £405.48k
Total expenditure £714.19k £814.05k £643.84k £691.32k £691.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A