Accounts and annual returns CONGREGATION OF THE CANONESSES REGULAR HOSPITALLERS OF THE MERCY OF JESUS OF THE ORDER OF ST AUGUSTINE AT WATERLOO
Charity number: 232621
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 09 November 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 88 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 November 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 88 days | |
Annual return | 09 November 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 November 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 10 March 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 09 July 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | 08 February 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | 08 February 2019 | On time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window