CORSCOMBE CHARITY OF GEORGE HENRY HAWKINS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support for children and the elderly within the Corscombe area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Dorset
Governance
- 05 June 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Deborah Anne Rix | Trustee | 05 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Harper | Trustee | 27 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
HENRY LOVEGROVE | Trustee | 07 January 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.32k | £833 | £862 | £1.34k | £1.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.10k | £220 | £593 | £1.28k | £111 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 27 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 29 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 27 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 19 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME SEALED 17TH DECEMBER 1992.
Charitable objects
INCOME TO BE APPLIED IN RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF CORSCOMBE, WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS. (SEE SCHEME FOR FURTHER DETAILS).
Area of benefit
PARISH OF CORSCOMBE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Comforts Orchard
Corscombe
DORCHESTER
DT2 0NX
- Phone:
- 01935891415
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window