Trustees THE LONDON WELSH CENTRE TRUST
Charity number: 232672

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD SAUNDERS | Chair | 12 May 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Charlotte Lythgoe | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Harriet Angharad Johnson | Trustee | 22 February 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Susan Elan Jones | Trustee | 24 August 2020 |
|
|||||||
Paul Wright | Trustee | 27 July 2020 |
|
|||||||
Hannah Roberts | Trustee | 27 July 2020 |
|
|||||||
DAVID DANIEL | Trustee | 27 July 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Gillian Heather Phillips | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Richard Williams | Trustee | 15 July 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Peter Allen | Trustee | 02 July 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Major Jonathon Poyner | Trustee | 05 February 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Tomos Davies | Trustee | 03 April 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.