TIVERTON AGRICULTURAL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 232688
Charity reporting is overdue by 116 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 Overdue Overdue by 116 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Overdue Overdue by 116 days
Annual return 31 July 2019 12 October 2020 134 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 24 September 2019 116 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 17 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 23 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required