FRIENDS OF THE MARY HEWETSON HOSPITAL, KESWICK

Charity number: 232708
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £19.63k £26.23k £20.35k £21.80k £18.37k
Total expenditure £4.10k £6.92k £10.29k £103.49k £810
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A