FRIENDS OF THE MARY HEWETSON HOSPITAL, KESWICK

Charity number: 232708
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JULIE VINEY Trustee 14 January 2013 None on record
Julie Ousby Trustee 24 February 2015 None on record
DOROTHY ANNE SAVAGE Chair None on record
DR JUDITH ANN ATACK Trustee 25 November 2015 None on record
CAROLE HARRISON Trustee None on record
DOCTOR PETER EDWIN HEMINGWAY Trustee None on record
SUSAN REID Trustee None on record
Gail Miller Trustee 04 January 2019 None on record
MARGARET MAUD BRAGG Trustee 03 February 2012 None on record
GLENDA MARY HOLME Trustee None on record
DR JIM COX Trustee 29 August 2017 None on record
Janice Mary Smith Trustee 03 February 2012 None on record
MIKE BULMAN Trustee 26 November 1994 None on record
SUSAN ROBINSON Trustee None on record
Dr Eugene Patrick Lambert Trustee 17 February 2021 None on record