Linked charities LIVERPOOL ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHDIOCESAN TRUST

Charity number: 232709
Charity reporting is overdue by 33 days
Linked charities
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 29 NOV 1933 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 15 MAR 1963 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 25 MAY 1964 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 07 JUL 1964 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 27 OCT 1965
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION IN THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHDIOCESE OF LIVERPOOL.
Area of benefit
LIVERPOOL, MERSEYSIDE
Registration history
  • 18 September 2006 : Standard registration