Financial history THE SOCIETY OF THE FAITH (INCORPORATED)

Charity number: 232821
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £170.01k £181.65k £169.71k £162.85k £156.98k
Total expenditure £93.39k £101.08k £166.20k £86.54k £105.53k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A