Trustees THE SOCIETY OF THE FAITH (INCORPORATED)
Charity number: 232821
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Andrew Stephen Hobley | Chair |
|
||||||||||||
Rev David John Stanton | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
Rev Peter John Galloway | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev David Lawrence Lawrence-March | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Timothy Patrick Abraham | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|||||||||||
WILLIAM EDWARD CHAPMAN CVO | Trustee | 24 July 2018 |
|
|||||||||||
Dr ANDREW CHANDLER | Trustee | 24 July 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
THE REVEREND STEPHEN REID TUCKER | Trustee | 24 July 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
Dr William Mungo Jacob | Trustee | 11 July 2017 |
|
|||||||||||
Rev CHRISTOPHER TRUNDLE | Trustee | 15 February 2017 |
|
|||||||||||
PETER GERALD GASTON | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||
Dr Brian John Taylor Hanson | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||
Martin Charles Woods | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||
THE REVD CANON ROBERT EDWARD GAGE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.