THE CHARITY ESTATE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the Charity shall be to relieve either generally or individually pesons resident in the area of the ancient parish of milton Bryan who are in conditions of need,hardship or distress
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 01 April 1964: Standard registration
- MILTON BRYAN CHARITY (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nigel Anthony David | Trustee | 15 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Berchielli | Trustee | 15 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Robert Hunt | Trustee | 15 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Jane Falle | Trustee | 15 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jonathon Barry Maddox | Trustee | 15 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Gibson Horrocks | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71.21k | £73.52k | £74.06k | £74.71k | £82.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.47k | £38.31k | £46.97k | £36.24k | £31.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 12/04/1973 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 23/01/2014
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INIDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF THE ANCIENT PARISH OF MELTON BRYAN WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF MILTON BRYAN
Contact information
- Address:
-
LYNDHURST
WATLING STREET
HOCKLIFFE
LEIGHTON BUZZARD
LU7 9LJ
- Phone:
- 07771555511
- Email:
- admin@rjknox.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window