THE BEREAN FORWARD MOVEMENT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We seek to encourage the public to read the Bible themselves and make up their own minds about the Truth revealed within its pages. To do this we hold services, meetings, and classes, providing facilities and resources for the study of, and teaching from, the Scriptures, in accordance with our values.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hackney
- Lancashire
- Australia
- Canada
- Philippines
- Scotland
- United States
Governance
- 04 August 1969: Standard registration
- 19 November 2017: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 19 November 2017: Funds transferred to 1157914 THE BEREAN PUBLISHING TRUST CIO
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61.17k | £47.84k | £52.56k | £54.98k | £59.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £79.00k | £69.25k | £69.66k | £64.87k | £69.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 14 November 2015 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 22 March 2016 | 143 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 01 November 2014 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | 01 November 2014 | 1 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 3RD APRIL 1944
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE AND ARRANGE FOR THE TEACHING AND OXPOSITION OF THE WORD OF GOD AND THE HOLDING OF SERVICES MEETINGS AND CLASSES FOR THE PURPOSE OF THE STUDY AND TEACHING OF THE HOLY SCRIPTURES AT WILSON STREET CHAPEL (NOW CALLED THE CHAPEL OF THE OPENED BOOK) OR ELSEWHERE, INACCORDANCE WITH THE FOUR BASIC TENETS SET OUT IN THE SCHEDULE TO THE DEED.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window