Financial history HIGHGATE WOOD AND QUEENS PARK KILBURN

Charity number: 232986
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.51m £1.40m £1.51m £1.52m £1.35m
Total expenditure £1.53m £1.42m £1.53m £1.53m £1.36m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £1.35m £1.36m £1.03m
Income - Donations and legacies £1.34m £1.25m £1.35m £1.37m £1.05m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £161.88k £151.23k £157.57k £137.76k £292.91k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £5.52k £6.01k £6.27k £6.83k £9.04k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £6.51k £716
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.53m £1.42m £1.53m £1.53m £1.36m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £38.08k £29.73k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0