BEACON HILL SPORTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision and maintenance of a village hall and sports facilities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £1,800 from 2 government contract(s)
People

18 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 16 April 1964: Standard registration
- CHARITY FOR A SPORTS OR RECREATION GROUND AND VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ross Lovell McTaggart | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Joseph Rayment | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Morrison | Trustee | 28 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stewart Wallace | Trustee | 14 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Graham Jacob | Trustee | 14 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Robinson | Trustee | 15 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bryony Rochester | Trustee | 18 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicole Carter | Trustee | 17 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Hughes | Trustee | 11 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Croom | Trustee | 11 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jane Williams BSc | Trustee | 05 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Lilian Laccohee | Trustee | 08 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Keith Ian Matten | Trustee | 10 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
SUE HARDING | Trustee | 05 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
MR ALEC FRASER | Trustee | 05 April 2012 |
|
|||||
GRAHAM REGINALD FINCH | Trustee | 06 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH JANE COESHALL BSC FCA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GORDON JOHN GREENLEAF | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £77.62k | £88.86k | £69.11k | £63.15k | £81.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £110.17k | £87.37k | £77.07k | £64.99k | £88.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £500 | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.80k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £35.00k | £42.08k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 04 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 04 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 30 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 30 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 14TH OCTOBER 1949
Charitable objects
REPAIRING AND MAINTAINING THE SPORTS OR RECREATION GROUND AND THE VILLAGE HALL, FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
WICKHAM BISHOPS GREAT TOTHAM GREAT BRAXTED LITTLE BRAXTED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Village Hall
Church Road
Wickham Bishops
WITHAM
CM8 3JZ
- Phone:
- 01621893588
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window