Trustees BEACON HILL SPORTS ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 232995
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Morrison | Trustee | 28 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stewart Wallace | Trustee | 14 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Graham Jacob | Trustee | 14 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Robinson | Trustee | 15 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ann Frances Goody | Trustee | 26 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Bryony Rochester | Trustee | 18 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicole Carter | Trustee | 17 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Hughes | Trustee | 11 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Croom | Trustee | 11 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jane Williams BSc | Trustee | 05 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Reginald Banham | Trustee | 06 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Lilian Laccohee | Trustee | 08 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Keith Ian Matten | Trustee | 10 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
SUE HARDING | Trustee | 05 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
MR ALEC FRASER | Trustee | 05 April 2012 |
|
|||||
MARGARET MACGREGOR | Trustee | 06 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM REGINALD FINCH | Trustee | 06 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH JANE COESHALL BSC FCA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GORDON JOHN GREENLEAF | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.