THE ABBEYFIELD SANDERSTEAD SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 233004
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £102.42k £102.70k £110.03k £101.27k £113.73k
Total expenditure £104.89k £97.85k £104.92k £119.65k £109.26k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A