THE ABBEYFIELD SANDERSTEAD SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 233004
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LYNDA ANN TALBOT Trustee 26 May 2016 None on record
BRIAN DYMOND Trustee None on record
Mary Alison Brown Trustee 12 September 2013 None on record
ROGER JOHN BRIMBLE Trustee 21 April 2015
THE CROYDON UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE Received: On time
Dr EILEEN ASSUMPTA LEONARD Trustee 14 April 2015 None on record
CAROLE DIANE LITTLEWOOD Trustee 27 September 2018 None on record