MRS MARY TURNER'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity number: 233062
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 11 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 03 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 23 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 29 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 27 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required