THE ST ASAPH DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE

Charity number: 233140
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 November 2020 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 05 November 2020 5 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 19 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 19 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 30 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 30 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 31 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 31 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 27 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 28 October 2016 On time Download