THE ST ASAPH DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE

Charity number: 233140
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MAVIS BARTLETT Trustee 12 September 2017
MOLD MISSION AREA Received: On time
GRIFFITH ROBERTS FOUNDATION Received: On time
Rev Hermione Jane Morris Trustee 02 September 2014
TANAT-VYRNWY MISSION AREA Recently registered
GLYN WILLIAMS Trustee 30 June 2020
DYNAMIC CENTRE FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES Received: On time
Rev CHRISTINE ROSE OWEN Trustee 11 September 2018
ALED MISSION AREA Overdue by 271 days
COLWYN BAY PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL Overdue by 271 days
Ven Andrew Stuart Grimwood Trustee 07 October 2018
THE DEAN AND CHAPTER OF ST ASAPH CATHEDRAL Received: On time
THE EVANGELICAL FELLOWSHIP IN THE CHURCH IN WALES Received: On time
THE WIDOWS, ORPHANS AND DEPENDANTS SOCIETY OF THE CHURCH IN WALES Received: On time
CLIVE MYERS Trustee None on record
Dr Lynne Ash Trustee 04 March 2014 None on record
The Venerable Dr Barry Frank Wilson Trustee 07 October 2018
THE DEAN AND CHAPTER OF ST ASAPH CATHEDRAL Received: On time
THE ST MELANGELL CENTRE Received: On time
Saint Melangell Shrine Church and Centre Recently registered
THE VERY REVD NIGEL HOWARD WILLIAMS Trustee 23 October 2012
NORTH WALES INTERNATIONAL MUSIC FESTIVAL LIMITED/GWYL GERDD GOGLEDD CYMRU CYFYNGEDIG Received: 67 days late
Rev HUW BUTLER MA Trustee 24 November 2016
CHARITY KNOWN AS ST MARTIN'S CHURCH HALL Received: On time
ALYN MISSION AREA Received: On time
HELEN Rosemary JONES Chair 23 October 2012
THE WIDOWS, ORPHANS AND DEPENDANTS SOCIETY OF THE CHURCH IN WALES Received: On time
THE REPRESENTATIVE BODY OF THE CHURCH IN WALES Received: On time
Sam Allin Trustee 30 June 2020 None on record
PHILIP WILLIAMS ACIB Trustee 04 March 2014 None on record
STUART RICHARDSON Trustee 30 June 2020 None on record
TREVOR TREVOR Trustee None on record
The Venerable John Derrick Percy Lomas Trustee 01 December 2014
HOPE STREET WREXHAM Recently registered
The Right Reverend GREGORY KENNETH CAMERON Trustee
ST MARY'S COLLEGE TRUST Received: On time
CYTUN:EGLWYSI YNGHYD YNG NGHYMRU / CHURCHES TOGETHER IN WALES LIMITED Received: On time
BRIDGET BEVAN'S FOUNDATION Received: On time
NORTH WALES INTERNATIONAL MUSIC FESTIVAL LIMITED/GWYL GERDD GOGLEDD CYMRU CYFYNGEDIG Received: 67 days late
POWIS EXHIBITION FUND Received: On time