THE BRADFORD DISTRICT CHARITY FOR VISUALLY IMPAIRED PEOPLE

Charity number: 233146
Charity reporting is up to date (22 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £9.94k £11.91k £11.91k £12.64k £14.14k
Total expenditure £1.26k £1.15k £1.34k £3.91k £2.33k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A