Linked charities THE BRADFORD DISTRICT CHARITY FOR VISUALLY IMPAIRED PEOPLE
Charity number: 233146

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEMES OF 31 MARCH 1931 AND 2 OCTOBER 1951
Charitable objects
FOR SOCIAL WORK AMONG THE BLIND. GRANTING PENSIONS TO POOR BLIND PERSONS ELSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF POOR BLIND PERSONS (FOR DETAILS SEE SCHEME OF 2ND OCTOBER 1951).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 19 May 1964 : Standard registration
- 10 September 2008 : Removed
- 10 September 2008 : Asset transfer out
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.