BROXTEAD HOUSING TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 233148
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 29 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 03 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 06 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 06 November 2017 279 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required