BROXTEAD HOUSING TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 233148
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £3.73k £5.71k £5.57k £26.85k £8.73k
Total expenditure £11.93k £3.12k £16.13k £43.03k £37.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £19.93k N/A