THE BRITISH ACADEMY FOR THE PROMOTION OF HISTORICAL PHILOSOPHICAL AND PHILOLOGICAL STUDIES

Charity number: 233176
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £39.54m £62.25m £52.91m £60.73m £63.03m
Total expenditure £38.94m £47.00m £52.41m £60.83m £63.35m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A £275.70k
Income from government grants £34.00m £56.21m £45.77m £54.87m £59.49m
Income - Donations and legacies £609.16k £250.88k £761.32k £324.61k £359.23k
Income - Other trading activities £2.31m £2.58m £2.88m £2.89m £586.20k
Income - Charitable activities £35.98m £58.75m £49.06m £56.64m £61.32m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £531.91k £0 £0
Income - Investment £453.35k £492.57k £552.66k £619.88k £462.49k
Income - Other £183.72k £172.89k £191.01k £249.33k £300.26k
Income - Legacies £387.50k £1.08k £30.00k £130.00k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £36.91m £44.80m £49.86m £57.80m £61.88m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.03m £2.20m £2.55m £3.03m £1.47m
Expenditure - Governance £200.75k £182.09k £195.27k £178.85k £178.85k
Expenditure - Grants institution £28.67m £37.68m £42.38m £50.10m £54.61m
Expenditure - Investment management £16.04k £0 £40.88k £13.35k £26.66k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0