CHARITY OF JOHN BEND

Charity Number: 233209
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Help to elderly of the parish, those whose income is under a certain amount per month

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £9,311
Total expenditure: £7,565

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 August 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • JOHN BENDS (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mark Fryett Trustee 14 January 2023
THE MIDDLE PIT AND THOLOMAS DROVE WASH PIT FUND
Received: On time
THE ENDOWED SCHOOL OF FRANCIS HARDY
Received: On time
David Wheatley Trustee 14 January 2023
THE ENDOWED SCHOOL OF FRANCIS HARDY
Received: On time
David Scrimshaw Trustee 30 June 2022
POORS ALLOTMENTS
Received: On time
JOHN BEND'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
PARSON DROVE UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
THE MIDDLE PIT AND THOLOMAS DROVE WASH PIT FUND
Received: On time
THE ENDOWED SCHOOL OF FRANCIS HARDY
Received: On time
COLIN DESBOROUGH Trustee 15 May 2013
THE ENDOWED SCHOOL OF FRANCIS HARDY
Received: On time
ANGELA WELDON Trustee 15 May 2013
THE ENDOWED SCHOOL OF FRANCIS HARDY
Received: On time
MARTIN HOLMES Trustee 15 May 2013
None on record
TONY FOWLER Trustee 15 May 2013
None on record
PETER ALLEN Trustee 15 May 2013
None on record
Peter NEWTON Trustee
None on record
MR S BLISS Trustee
None on record
CHARLES ALLEN Trustee
THE MIDDLE PIT AND THOLOMAS DROVE WASH PIT FUND
Received: On time
POORS ALLOTMENTS
Received: On time
THE ENDOWED SCHOOL OF FRANCIS HARDY
Received: On time
PHILIP RALPH WADSLEY Trustee
THE ENDOWED SCHOOL OF FRANCIS HARDY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £8.45k £8.31k £12.00k £9.29k £9.31k
Total expenditure £18.09k £9.82k £15.19k £7.98k £7.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 22 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 15 April 2024 70 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 25 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 29 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 05 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE LIMES
HAROLDS BANK
GOREFIELD
WISBECH
PE13 4PU
Phone:
07962319136
Website:

No information available