Accounts and annual returns DOMINICAN SISTERS (THIRD ORDER) CONGREGATION OF NEWCASTLE NATAL (ESTABLISHED AT BUSHEY HEATH, HERTS)

Charity number: 233236
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 16 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 16 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 19 May 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 02 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 02 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 27 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 27 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 06 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 06 September 2017 On time Download Open in new window