Financial history DOMINICAN SISTERS (THIRD ORDER) CONGREGATION OF NEWCASTLE NATAL (ESTABLISHED AT BUSHEY HEATH, HERTS)

Charity number: 233236
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.20m £2.27m £2.34m £2.34m £1.89m
Total expenditure £2.26m £2.12m £2.02m £2.07m £1.95m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £591.10k £601.00k £571.62k £552.42k £549.19k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £54.91k £52.00k £58.16k £71.03k £20.32k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.54m £1.60m £1.71m £1.72m £1.32m
Income - Other £2.32m £14.00k £2.85k £1.82k £1.86k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.17m £2.02m £1.92m £1.95m £1.85m
Expenditure - Raising funds £91.82k £104.00k £105.37k £113.14k £108.50k
Expenditure - Governance £35.38k £38.00k £44.00k £42.83k £44.97k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £26.45k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £91.82k £104.00k £105.37k £113.14k £108.50k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0