WORLD DAY OF PRAYER NATIONAL COMMITTEE FOR ENGLAND, WALES AND NORTHERN IRELAND

Charity number: 233242
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 26 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 11 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 01 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 01 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 02 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 02 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 25 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 25 April 2017 On time Download