WORLD DAY OF PRAYER NATIONAL COMMITTEE FOR ENGLAND, WALES AND NORTHERN IRELAND

Charity number: 233242
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £498.22k £530.58k £340.52k £480.35k £435.41k
Total expenditure £523.44k £548.14k £421.24k £379.70k £417.58k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £491.71k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £38.65k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £215 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £548.14k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £6.80k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £281.56k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A