Trustees HOUSING THE HOMELESS CENTRAL FUND

Charity number: 233254
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ELIZABETH ROGULA Chair 21 April 2010
IMAGO COMMUNITY
Received: On time
Deputy Christopher Hayward CC Trustee 14 February 2019
THE GUILD OF THE ROYAL HOSPITAL OF ST BARTHOLOMEW
Received: On time
RUBY SAYED CC Trustee 19 July 2018
None on record
Deputy Keith David Forbes Bottomley CC Trustee 09 February 2016
FRIENDS OF ST MARGARET PATTENS CHURCH
Received: On time
THE PATTENMAKERS COMPANY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE CITY OF LONDON BRIDGE WARD CLUB NORWEGIAN BUSINESS SCHOLARS TRUST
Received: On time
THE ROYAL SOCIETY OF ST GEORGE (CITY OF LONDON BRANCH) BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
DEPUTY HENRY JONES Trustee 01 June 2012
None on record
Jeremy Lewis Simons OBE Trustee 21 September 2004
ST ANDREW HOLBORN AND STAFFORD'S CHARITY
Received: On time
HEATH HANDS
Received: On time
TONY ZOTTI MBE Trustee 25 September 2002
None on record
Wendy Mead OBE Trustee 01 March 2000
THE CITY ARTS TRUST LIMITED
Overdue by 23 days
GRESHAM COLLEGE
Received: On time
COLIN MASON Trustee 01 March 1998
None on record