MR HERBERT MILLER'S SETTLEMENT TRUST

Charity number: 233334
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 22 April 2020 19 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 22 April 2020 19 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 22 April 2019 25 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 22 April 2019 25 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 22 April 2018 23 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 22 April 2018 23 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 22 April 2017 16 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 22 April 2017 16 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 22 April 2016 11 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 22 April 2016 11 August 2016 On time Download