MR HERBERT MILLER'S SETTLEMENT TRUST

Charity number: 233334
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 22/04/2016 22/04/2017 22/04/2018 22/04/2019 22/04/2020
Total gross income £53.73k £68.06k £57.30k £56.93k £47.71k
Total expenditure £56.40k £68.06k £53.99k £57.54k £47.46k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A