THE BARKWAY NON-ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITIES

Charity number: 233343
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REVD RUTH CHERYL PYKE Trustee 27 June 2016
CHURCH AND POOR'S LAND(BARLEY) Received: On time
Susan Biggs Trustee 04 October 2021 None on record
Sarah Wylie Trustee 01 January 2020 None on record
Juliet Turner Trustee 22 January 2018 None on record
Joanna Aldridge Trustee 28 September 2020 None on record
JOANNE BARKER Trustee None on record
ALISON GOWER Trustee 21 November 2013 None on record
MRS JANE GREENING Trustee None on record